MD HB851 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the deferral of payment of the registration fee for specified classifications of vehicles subject to specified requirements; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to revoke the registration of a vehicle if the owner fails to complete payment of the vehicle registration fee in accordance with the Act; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations to implement the Act; terminating the Act at the end of September 30, 2015; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Fees - Payment Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0851.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0851f.pdf |