MD HB843 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Frederick County a beauty salon beer and wine license; requiring that a recipient of the license be a holder of a beauty salon permit; authorizing a license holder to provide beer and wine by the glass for consumption by a customer receiving cosmetology services or when a fund-raising event is held; prohibiting the license from being transferred to another location; providing that the establishment for which the license is issued is subject to specified alcohol awareness training requirements; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873898/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
Frederick County
Gifts
Licenses
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Fees
Frederick County
Gifts
Licenses
Weights and Measures