MD HB838 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program in the Prince George's County public school system; providing that the purpose of the Program is to increase the number of registered family child care providers, registered family child care homes, and registered large family child care homes in low-income communities in the county; requiring a local school system to develop a certain application process; etc.
Title
Prince George's County Family Child Care Home Expansion Grant Program - Establishment PG 505-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-19) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103627/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Building Codes
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Inspections
Job Training
Language
Low-Income
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Building Codes
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Inspections
Job Training
Language
Low-Income
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 4 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |