MD HB83 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a court from requiring publication of notice in an action for change of name of a minor if each parent or guardian consents to the name change or the court finds that it is in the best interest of the minor to consider the action for a change of name without publication of notice, the minor has not been convicted of a crime as an adult, and the minor has never registered as a sex offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Action for Change of Name - Minors - Prohibition of Publication Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (128-9)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {772611/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback