MD HB83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a court from requiring publication of notice in an action for change of name of a minor if each parent or guardian consents to the name change or the court finds that it is in the best interest of the minor to consider the action for a change of name without publication of notice, the minor has not been convicted of a crime as an adult, and the minor has never registered as a sex offender.
Title
Action for Change of Name - Minors - Prohibition of Publication Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {772611/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |