MD HB818 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a subscriber organization for a community solar energy generating system to participate in consolidated billing provided by the electric company serving the territory of the community solar energy generating system.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263520/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Solar Energy
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Energy Matters
Public Service Commission
Solar Energy
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |