MD HB814 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program to improve data collection on uninsured individuals and to maximize enrollment of eligible uninsured individuals in affordable insurance programs; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to establish a Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Advisory Workgroup; requiring the Comptroller to include a certain checkoff, to indicate whether an individual is interested in obtaining minimum essential health coverage, on certain State income tax forms; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Julian Ivey [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Mike Rogers [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]
Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-15) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-12) (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (123-15)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {877971/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (119-12)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {716387/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0814&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0814f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0814t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0814e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0814_71638701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0814_87797101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0814.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0814_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0576.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0814_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0814_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1312.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1532.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback