MD HB814 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Health Insurance Option and the purpose of the Option; requiring certain individuals who are under a certain age to maintain certain minimum essential coverage for the individual and certain household members; requiring a certain individual to pay a certain amount if certain coverage is not maintained for a certain period of time of a certain taxable year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Insurance Option (Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2019)

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Julian Ivey [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Mike Rogers [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]
Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-12) (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (119-12)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {716387/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback