MD HB811 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, if a complaint filed with a Department of Juvenile Services intake officer alleges that a child violated specified laws relating to prostitution, the intake officer shall refuse authorization to file a delinquency petition with the juvenile court, shall immediately refer the child to a program that provides services for victims of human trafficking, may authorize shelter care, and, under specified circumstances, shall notify the local department of social services; etc.
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Human Rights
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Social Services
Victims
Human Rights
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Social Services
Victims