MD HB801 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Washington County a Class B beer (on-sale) license, a Class B beer and light wine (on-sale) license, and a Class B beer, wine and liquor (on-sale) license; specifying license fees; repealing provisions concerning a Class P pouring license; authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to issue a sidewalk cafe license to a holder of specified Class B licenses under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 |
2015-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473297/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Discipline
Fees
Fines
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Restaurants
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Discipline
Fees
Fines
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Reports
Restaurants
Washington County