MD HB796 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the sales and use tax a sale by a chartered organization of the Boy Scouts of America or a scout unit chartered by a local council of the Boy Scouts of America in the State, or by a troop of the Girl Scouts of the USA.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy Scouts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |