MD HB793 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the duties of the County Clerk of Washington County; repealing a requirement that the County Clerk execute a specified bond before beginning the duties of the office; repealing requirements that each Washington County agency file with the County Clerk the names and addresses of all attorneys representing the agency and of all members of the agency who are attorneys; repealing requirements that the County Clerk maintain specified lists of names filed by each Washington County agency; etc.
Title
Washington County - County Clerk
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys
Bonds
Counties - Local Laws
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Washington County
Attorneys
Bonds
Counties - Local Laws
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Washington County