MD HB789 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making alterations to the Catastrophic Event Account to allow funds to be used by a unit of local government.
Title
Catastrophic Event Account - Unit of Local Government - Authorized Fund
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263324/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333128/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Subjects
Appropriations
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Loans
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Loans
Public Safety
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |