MD HB775 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the intention of the General Assembly that the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services implement certain reforms at the Maryland Correctional Institution for Women to the extent that funds are available in the State budget; including in the reforms to be instituted, by February 1, 2020, female inmates designated in prerelease status are to be offered comprehensive prerelease services that are the same as and of equal quality to the comprehensive prerelease services provided and offered to male inmates; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Institution for Women - Reforms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {792514/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Disabilities
Discipline
Education
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parole and Probation
Pregnancy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Disabilities
Discipline
Education
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parole and Probation
Pregnancy
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment