MD HB753 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending, from June 30, 2016, to June 30, 2019, the termination provisions for the credit allowed against the State income tax for specified film production activities; limiting the annual amount of film production activity tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Business and Economic Development may issue to $25,000,000 for fiscal years 2017, 2018, and 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Advertising
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Electronic Government
Income Tax
Minorities
Motion Pictures
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Tourism
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Electronic Government
Income Tax
Minorities
Motion Pictures
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Tourism