MD HB744 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish and maintain a landman registry; prohibiting a person from acting, offering to act, or holding oneself out in the State as a landman unless registered with the Department; requiring a person to apply for registration by submitting a specified form, paying a $100 nonrefundable 2-year registration fee, and complying with specified requirements; requiring the Department to register and issue a registration number to specified applicants; defining "landman"; etc.
Title
Business Occupations - Landmen - Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters & Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Coal
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Fees
Fines
Fuel
Hearings
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Mining
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Wells
Coal
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Fees
Fines
Fuel
Hearings
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leases and Rent
Mining
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Wells
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0744.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0744f.pdf |