MD HB743 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an electric company to contract for certain renewable energy credits and electricity generated from certain Tier 1 renewable sources to meet a portion of the renewable energy portfolio standard for the electric company; requiring an electric company to solicit certain bids and award certain contracts in a certain manner; providing for certain remuneration for certain contracts; providing a required minimum of 10 years and maximum term of 20 years for certain contracts; etc.
Title
Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Energy
Energy Matters
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Rules and Regulations
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |