MD HB724 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the inclusion, in a policy that insures a health care provider against damages due to medical injury arising from providing or failing to provide health care, of coverage for the defense of a health care provider in a specified disciplinary hearing only in accordance with specified requirements; etc.
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsors
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Sally Jameson [D] |
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793391/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Discipline
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Medical Malpractice
Physicians
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Medical Malpractice
Physicians