MD HB722 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, in consultation with the Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board to develop and adopt regulations, on or before October 1, 2022, that require employers to protect employees from heat-related illness caused by heat stress; requiring Maryland Occupational Safety and Health to hold certain informational meetings before beginning a certain process; requiring the Commissioner to consider certain standards in developing regulations; requiring the Commissioner to make a certain report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 308
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (96-37)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {723693/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB434 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment51201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback