MD HB72 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1097

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 1:00 pm House Economic Matters Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain provisions related to the payment of wages, including the application, penalty, and enforcement provisions of the Maryland Wage and Hour Law and the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law, the provision of information related to the payment of wages by employers to employees, and adverse actions by an employer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseHearing canceled
2022-01-13HouseHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2021-10-29HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1097 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB78 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Withdrawn by Sponsor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment3103(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3403(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3423(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3428(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3501.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3504(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3507.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment3508(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback