MD HB713 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB20
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an adult from allowing a minor to ride a horse on certain property unless the minor is wearing a helmet that meets certain standards.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Horse Riding - Helmet Requirement for Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment {593620/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Saab) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB713 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |