MD HB711 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the State considers certain amendments to the Potomac River Compact to be in effect.
Title
Potomac River Compact – Clarification of the Effectiveness of Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB466 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Subjects
Hunting and Fishing
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes