MD HB701 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission, in consultation with the Secretary of Health, to set the compensation of certain Commission employees; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Secretary of Health, to determine the positions for which the Commission may set compensation; and authorizing the Comptroller, the Treasurer, and the Attorney General, in consultation with the Secretary of Budget and Management, to set the pay scale of certain positions in their offices.
Title
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission and Offices of the Comptroller, Treasurer, and Attorney General - Compensation and Pay Scales of Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153128/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB556 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Subjects
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 2106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 4 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |