MD SB556 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission, in consultation with the Secretary of Health, to set the compensation of certain Commission employees; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Secretary of Health, to determine the positions for which the Commission may set compensation; and specifying that the Community Health Resources Commission Fund includes money from the Cigarette Restitution Fund, appropriated in a certain manner.
Title
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Compensation of Employees and Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113927/1 Adopted |
2023-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB701 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
Subjects
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 2106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |