MD HB677 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Hearing 4/9 at 9:00 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Hearing 4/9 at 9:00 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified residential customers are entitled to only two directory assistance calls each month without charge; requiring the Public Service Commission to approve other charges for directory assistance, subject to an exception; and repealing a provision that authorizes the Commission to establish additional exemptions from directory assistance charges.
Title
Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Charges for Directory Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Hearing 4/9 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (124-10) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters |