MD HB641 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing licensing requirements for certain coin operated games in Carroll County.
Title
Carroll County - Coin Operated Games - Repeal of Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |