MD HB636 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from the inheritance tax for property that passes from a decedent to or for the use of a niece or nephew of the decedent; repealing a certain exemption to the inheritance tax made obsolete by the Act; and applying the Act to decedents dying after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback