MD HB634 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor, each fiscal year, to include a $1,000,000 appropriation in the annual budget bill to the Maryland Center for History and Culture to assist the Center in preserving its collection, maintaining a historical museum, and providing access to the public, including educational programs.
Title
Maryland Center for History and Culture – Annual Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB915 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Education
Governor
Historical Matters
Museums
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Education
Governor
Historical Matters
Museums
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5A | 331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |