MD HB631 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health make certain recommendations for the appointment of certain members of the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators after consulting with certain associations and societies; and requiring the Secretary to recommend to the Governor professionals who have certain qualifications for certain appointments to the Board.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {536688/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Elderly
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Homes
Time
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Elderly
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Homes
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 9 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |