MD SB444 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health make certain recommendations for the appointment of certain members of the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators after consulting with certain associations and societies; and requiring the Secretary to recommend to the Governor professionals who have certain qualifications for certain appointments to the Board.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators – Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 280 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {727072/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB631 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 279
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Elderly
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Homes
Time
Communications
Elderly
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Homes
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 9 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |