MD HB609 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health to be the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health and providing that the Office is an independent unit of the State, rather than a unit in the Department; requiring an annual report by December 1 of the Office's activities investigating fraud and waste of certain funds, referrals to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit, recoveries of mistaken claims paid in error, recoveries of the cost of benefits mistakenly paid, and regulatory changes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-3)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {736087/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB963 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General2501(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2502(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2502.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General2506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback