MD HB393 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB609
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Office of the Inspector General in the Maryland Department of Health to be the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health and providing that the Office is an independent unit of the State, rather than a unit in the Department; requiring an annual report by December 1 of the Office's activities investigating fraud and waste of certain funds, referrals to the Medicaid Fraud Control Unit, recoveries of mistaken claims paid in error, recoveries of the cost of benefits mistakenly paid, and regulatory changes; etc.
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-07-09 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
HB609 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
HB609 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Ethics
Fraud
Health
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Names
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Ethics
Fraud
Health
Health, Department of
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Names
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 2 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 2 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |