MD HB603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license as a self-service storage producer to an owner or operator of a self-service storage facility and certain individuals who meet specified requirements; providing for the scope of the license; providing that an owner is not required to be licensed under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for a license to file a specified application with the Commissioner; etc.
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsors
Del. Sally Jameson [D] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] |
Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Kelly Schulz [R] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {843897/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Boats and Ships
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Education
Fines
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Records
Reports
Restitution
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment
Boats and Ships
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Education
Fines
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Personal Property
Publications
Records
Reports
Restitution
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Work, Labor and Employment