MD HB588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition against a community care retirement community provider, subscriber, or group of subscribers being represented by counsel during a certain mediation procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 243
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {596785/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback