MD HB569 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a retiree of the State Police Retirement System to be reemployed in a permanent position, subject to specified limitations; requiring a retiree of the State Police Retirement System to earn service credit in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System under specified circumstances; and repealing a specified termination provision pertaining to the reemployment of retirees of the State Police Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2015-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-16HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2015-02-12HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback