MD HB567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified research facilities using dogs and cats for scientific research purposes to take specified steps to provide for the adoption of a dog or cat that is no longer needed for scientific research purposes; establishing specified penalties for specified violations; requiring the Attorney General to investigate specified violations; and authorizing the Attorney General to prosecute specified violations.
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Adoption
Animals
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Animals
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology