MD HB564 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB231
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Montgomery County to designate the Montgomery County Department of Transportation as the agency responsible for implementing automated traffic enforcement programs in the county; requiring that an employee of the Montgomery County Department of Transportation, instead of a law enforcement officer, under certain circumstances, sign a certain required statement on a citation issued through the use of automated traffic enforcement systems in Montgomery County; etc.
Title
Montgomery County – Automated Traffic Enforcement – Implementing Agency MC 04–21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-39) |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB564 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Highways
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Photography
Records
Signatures
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Certifications
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Highways
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Photography
Records
Signatures
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |