MD HB553 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a parent has the fundamental right to direct the upbringing, education, care, and welfare of the parent's child; and prohibiting the State or a political subdivision from infringing on a parent's fundamental right to direct the upbringing, education, care, and welfare of the parent's child unless the State or political subdivision can demonstrate by clear and convincing evidence certain factors.
Title
Family Law - Fundamental Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB438 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-23 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
HB666 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
HB666 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5-2B | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2B | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2B | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0553?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0553f.pdf |