MD SB438 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB566
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-23 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a parent has the fundamental right to direct the upbringing, education, care, and welfare of the parent's child; and prohibiting the State or a political subdivision from infringing on a parent's fundamental right to direct the upbringing, education, care, and welfare of the parent's child unless the State or political subdivision can demonstrate by clear and convincing evidence certain factors.
Title
Family Law - Fundamental Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB566 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB553 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB553 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5-2B | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2B | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5-2B | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0438?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0438f.pdf |