MD HB550 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date for various provisions relating to alcoholic beverages manufacturer's licenses and off-site permits, including provisions repealing specified permits and establishing a manufacturer off-site permit and brewery special event permit; extending the termination date for provisions relating to the authorization of holders of certain manufacturer's licenses to sell and deliver and to directly ship their own alcoholic beverages products to certain individuals under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393923/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB476 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Fees
Special Events
Sunset
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Fees
Special Events
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |