MD HB546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the members of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County to reside in Anne Arundel County; establishing a 4-year term for nonstudent members; and limiting nonstudent members to three consecutive full terms; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 245 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {494066/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB31 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency
Time
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency
Time