MD SB31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the members of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County to reside in Anne Arundel County; establishing a 4-year term for nonstudent members; limiting nonstudent members to three consecutive full terms; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 246 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494338/1 Adopted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494338/1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB546 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 245
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency
Time
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency
Time