MD HB537 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to install, replace, or have installed or replaced a specified on-site sewage disposal system that does not utilize specified nitrogen removal technology on specified property located outside the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area; requiring the Department of the Environment or the local approving authority to impose a fee of $200 for a residential on-site sewage disposal system and $100 per 1,000 square feet for a non-residential building on-site sewage disposal system; etc.
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems and Funding for Wastewater Treatment Facilities and Sewerage Systems
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Fees
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Utilities
Environment
Environment, Department of
Equipment
Fees
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Utilities