MD HB525 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the period during which the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City must contribute a specified amount to the annual operating deficits of the Baltimore Convention facility; and extending to December 31, 2019, the date after which Baltimore City is solely responsible for all operating deficits and capital improvements for the Baltimore Convention facility.
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-30) (Y: 103 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-30) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {214860/1 Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |