MD HB523 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Hearing: Feb 21 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a school-approved sport, club, or course of instruction from using lead ammunition in training, practice, or athletic competition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Use of Lead Ammunition in School Programs - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2019-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback