MD HB518 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $124,500 to $146,500, the maximum annual salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a register of wills.
Title
Registers of Wills - Maximum Salary - Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-32) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB232 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Estates and Trusts
Public Officials
Registers of Wills
Salaries and Compensation
Estates and Trusts
Public Officials
Registers of Wills
Salaries and Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |