MD HB517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum fine for a certain motor vehicle violation related to the right-of-way for pedestrians in crosswalks from $500 to $1,000.
Title
Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-17) (Y: 120 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-17) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {470816/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Fines
Highways
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Fines
Highways
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning