MD HB514 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the publication requirements for the statewide greenhouse gas emissions inventory; requiring the Department of the Environment, beginning January 1, 2020, and on January 1 of each even-numbered year thereafter through 2030, to establish a greenhouse gas emissions reduction target; requiring that the target be set at a certain amount and expressed in a certain manner; providing that the Department is not required to sequester more than a certain amount of carbon dioxide emissions; etc.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Statewide Greenhouse Gas Inventory and Carbon Sequestration
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Contracts
Data
Energy
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Operating Budget
Pollution
Prices
Publications
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Contracts
Data
Energy
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Operating Budget
Pollution
Prices
Publications
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Weights and Measures