MD HB507 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-19 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-19 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a supervised medical graduate to provide delegated duties under direct supervision in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Board of Physicians; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Supervised Medical Graduates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963423/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Hospitals
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Hospitals
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |