MD HB492 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the sale of oral hygiene products from the sales and use tax.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Oral Hygiene Products - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Saab) Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213924/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB571 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-01 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |